SICKLES v. AVCO CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: BRENDA SICKLES
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION, THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA INC., EATON CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, DANA COMPANIES LLC, H.M. ROYAL, INC., DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE LLC, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, CRANE CO., INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, CBS CORPORATION and HENKEL CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv16688
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AVCO CORPORATION re #7 First MOTION to Remand to state court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(MILLER, H.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA PASCARELLA on behalf of CRANE CO. (PASCARELLA, LISA)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Continuing the Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/05/2019 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/26/2019. (jem)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Joint stipulation continuing initial scheduling conference by BRENDA SICKLES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order continuing initial scheduling conference)(KRAMER, JAMES)
September 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Remand to state court. Motion reset for 10/21/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER granting the request to adjourn the #7 Motion to Remand date to 10/21/2019; opposition papers due 10/07/2019 and reply papers due 10/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/20/2019. (jem)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by AFIGO IFEOMA FADAHUNSI on behalf of CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (FADAHUNSI, AFIGO)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW on behalf of CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (BLOW, DAVID)
September 15, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Remand to state court. Motion reset for 10/7/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Remand to state court. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand to state court by BRENDA SICKLES. (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff's memorandum of law in support of motion to remand, #2 Certification Certification of James M. Kramer in support of motion to remand, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order Plaintiff's motion to remand, #5 Exhibit Sickles court filed complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arthur Gross transcript, #7 Exhibit AVCO answer)(KRAMER, JAMES)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES MICHAEL KRAMER on behalf of BRENDA SICKLES (KRAMER, JAMES)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE DANIEL RODGERS on behalf of DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE LLC, HENKEL CORPORATION (RODGERS, JESSE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE W. CAMP on behalf of THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (CAMP, TERENCE)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVCO CORPORATION identifying Textron, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, H.)
August 15, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AVCO CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-02244-19 AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9893979), filed by AVCO CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit All Filed Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses, #4 Exhibit Deposition Transcript)(MILLER, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SICKLES v. AVCO CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION
Represented By: H. LOCKWOOD MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: TERENCE W. CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Represented By: AFIGO IFEOMA FADAHUNSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.M. ROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE LLC
Represented By: JESSE DANIEL RODGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: DAVID SCHUYLER BLOW
Represented By: AFIGO IFEOMA FADAHUNSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENKEL CORPORATION
Represented By: JESSE DANIEL RODGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA SICKLES
Represented By: LAURENCE V NASSIF
Represented By: JAMES MICHAEL KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?