EVANS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MARCUS LANDEZ EVANS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv16816
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by MARCUS LANDEZ EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically, #3 Application IFP, #4 Pro Bono Motion)(jmh)
August 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmh)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. However, Plaintiff merely alleges in conclusory fashion, that the Administrative Law Judge's decision was rendered in error. Therefore, Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended Complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Pro Bono Counsel is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 08/22/2019. (jmh, )
August 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Application for Pro Bono attached to docket entry 3 filed by the Clerk's office on 8/16/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jdb)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by MARCUS LANDEZ EVANS. (jdb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Pro Bono Counsel by MARCUS LANDEZ EVANS. (jdb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent and Registration form to Receive Documents Electronically by MARCUS LANDEZ EVANS (jdb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS LANDEZ EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?