CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., MALLINCKRODT LLC, BEVERLY SACKLER, RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS INC., WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC., ALLERGAN PLC, WALGREEN BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THERESA SACKLER, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, RITE AID CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., JONATHAN SACKLER, RICHARD SACKLER, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES INC., MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, COLLEGIUM PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WALMART INC., ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, INSYS THERAPEUTICS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, SPECGX LLC, JOHN KAPOOR, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, DAVID SACKLER, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA INC., CVS PHARMACY, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P. and KATHE SACKLER
Case Number: 3:2019cv17155
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KURT MICHAEL MULLEN on behalf of JOHN KAPOOR (MULLEN, KURT)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY re #10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trenton Remand Brief, #3 Exhibit 2 - Worcester Decision, #4 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of 12-13-17 Teleconference, #5 Exhibit 4 - Order Regarding Remands, #6 Exhibit 5 - Remand Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Carbon County Remand Motion, #8 Exhibit 7 - Delaware County Remand Motion, #9 Exhibit 8 - Judge Dozor Ltr, #10 Exhibit 9 - Paterson Stay Motion Reply, #11 Exhibit 10 - Monmouth Motion to Stay, #12 Exhibit 11 - 4 Transfer Orders, #13 Exhibit 12 - Protocol for Coordination)(SCOLNICK, JUDITH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY re #8 MOTION to Remand (SCOLNICK, JUDITH)
October 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL)
September 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - CTO-111, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Orders, #5 Exhibit C - West Virginia decision, #6 Exhibit D - Granite City, Ill decision, #7 Exhibit E - Oklahoma decision, #8 Exhibit F - Anderson Cty, SC decision, #9 Exhibit G - Worcester decision, #10 Exhibit H - Boston decision, #11 Exhibit I - El Monte decision, #12 Exhibit J - Monmouth Stay motion, #13 Exhibit K - JPML Ntc of Hrg Session, #14 Exhibit L - 2-16-18 MDL Order re Remands, #15 Exhibit M - MDL Hrg Tr re remands, #16 Exhibit N - NJ-AG Janssen CPT)(SCOLNICK, JUDITH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by PURDUE PHARMA INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P. OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulating Defendants, without waiver of any defenses, including lack of personal jurisdiction defenses, shall have through and including 30 days after the later of (i) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, should Plaintiff file one, or (ii) the final decision of the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation regarding any transfer of this case to the MDL, to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/05/2019. (jmh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEWIT, RUSSELL)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN HAHN on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (HAHN, STEVEN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to LEE S. GOLDSMITH re mandatory eFiling. (abr)
August 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - LEE S. GOLDSMITH appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr)
August 26, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HEWIT, RUSSELL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCKESSON CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MER L 1167 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916489), filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix A to Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: RUSSELL LYLE HEWIT
Represented By: STEVEN HAHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEVERLY SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLEGIUM PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KAPOOR
Represented By: KURT MICHAEL MULLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHE SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY
Represented By: LEE S. GOLDSMITH
Represented By: JUDITH S. SCOLNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?