MCLEAN v. 800 DC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RUTH T. MCLEAN
Defendant: 800 DC, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv17310
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 Submission received by RUTH T. MCLEAN. (jdb)
October 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the 30 Proposed Order filed by Matthew Wurgaft on 10/18/2019 was filed incorrectly as a Letter. For future reference, when filing a Proposed Order, a letter or supporting documents need to be filed also, or the Proposed Order should have been attached with the #19 Motion for Summary Judgment. This message is for informational purposes only. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court (jmh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Matthew Wurgaft containing proposed Order re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
October 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by 800 DC, LLC. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #8 Motion for a venue stay Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/16/2019. (jdb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Matthew Wurgaft re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #8 MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Order [Proposed])(WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Case Management Conference held on 10/16/2019. Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RUTH T. MCLEAN - Ordered motion denied; #8 MOTION to Stay filed by RUTH T. MCLEAN - Ordered motion granted; counsel will submit an appropriate order. (Court Reporter: Megan McKay-Soule.) (DS)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Elizabeth L. Sokol, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/16/2019. (jem)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 Reply to Defendant Motion to Dismiss and Request for Summary Judgment. re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (jdb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by 800 DC, LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #2 Exhibit Judgment, #3 Exhibit Notice to Debtor and Domesticated Judgment, #4 Exhibit Judgment for Attorneys Fees, #5 Exhibit Ch. 13 Bankruptcy Docket Report, #6 Exhibit Ch. 13 Bankruptcy Dismissal Order, #7 Exhibit Certification of Foreign Judgment, #8 Exhibit 09.25.18 NJ Order, #9 Exhibit 10.26.18 NJ Order, #10 Exhibit 12.07.18 NJ Order)(WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #11 Letter request is Granted. The case management conference will be rescheduled for 10/16/2019 @10:00 a.m. Also, clients and representatives with full settlement authority may be available by telephone. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/1/2019. (DS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Matthew Wurgaft re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
September 30, 2019 Notice of Hearing: Case Management Conference re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/9/2019 @10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Also, clients and representatives with full settlement authority must be present. Please confirm receipt of court notice by e-filing letter not later than 10/1/2019. (DS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 800 DC, LLC. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
September 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Venue Stay. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by RUTH T. MCLEAN re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Defendant's request to Change Venue. (km) Modified on 10/1/2019 (eaj, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Venue Stay by RUTH T. MCLEAN. (km)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Matthew Wurgaft re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
September 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 800 DC, LLC. 800 DC, LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 800 DC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by RUTH T. MCLEAN. (jdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 800 DC LLC, 800 DC, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by RUTH T. MCLEAN (jdb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 800 DC LLC, 800 DC, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number TRE105347) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RUTH T. MCLEAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCLEAN v. 800 DC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 800 DC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH T. MCLEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?