AAM AUTO SALES, LLC v. MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: AAM AUTO SALES, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv17648
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 24 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Defendants by AAM AUTO SALES, LLC.(DOBBS, SETH)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. DOBBS on behalf of AAM AUTO SALES, LLC (DOBBS, SETH)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard Sox, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/07/2020. (jem)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Micah Andrews, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/07/2020. (jem)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason Allen, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/07/2020. (jem)
January 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #17 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason Allen, #19 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard Sox, #18 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Micah Andrews. Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard Sox by AAM AUTO SALES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Seth L. Dobbs, #2 Certification Richard Sox, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Richard Sox)(DOBBS, SETH)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Micah Andrews by AAM AUTO SALES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Seth L. Dobbs, #2 Certification Micah Andrews, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Micah Andrews)(DOBBS, SETH)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason Allen by AAM AUTO SALES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Seth L. Dobbs, #2 Certification Jason Allen, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Jason Allen)(DOBBS, SETH)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 01/13/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/16/2019. (jmh)
December 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AAM AUTO SALES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DOBBS, SETH)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM against AAM AUTO SALES, LLC, filed by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC..(LONEY, STEPHEN)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ryan L. Ford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LONEY, STEPHEN)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Sullivan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LONEY, STEPHEN)
November 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Ryan L. Ford: $ 150, receipt number TRE107372 (mg)
November 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to John Sullivan: $ 150, receipt number TRE107373 (mg)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties due by 1/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/07/2019. (jem)
November 7, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/7/2019. (ce3)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Sullivan, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/01/2019. (jem)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan L. Ford, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/01/2019. (jem)
November 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Sullivan,, #7 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan L. Ford. Motions set for 12/2/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Sullivan, by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 JOHN SULLIVAN CERTIFICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE, #2 CERTIFICATION OF STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT JOHN SULLIVAN PRO HAC VICE, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LONEY, STEPHEN)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan L. Ford by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 RYAN L. FORD CERTIFICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE, #2 CERTIFICATION OF STEPHEN A. LONEY, JR. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT RYAN L. FORD PRO HAC VICE, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LONEY, STEPHEN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA KLARFELD JACOBS on behalf of MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. (JACOBS, JESSICA)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. DOBBS on behalf of AAM AUTO SALES, LLC (DOBBS, SETH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC..(LONEY, STEPHEN)
September 5, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.. (LONEY, STEPHEN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Somerset County, case number SOM-L-947-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9942482), filed by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LONEY, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AAM AUTO SALES, LLC v. MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN ALLEN LONEY, JR.
Represented By: JESSICA KLARFELD JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAM AUTO SALES, LLC
Represented By: SETH L. DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?