SAVVIS et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: PETER SAVVIS and DEBRA SAVVIS
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv17754
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Case extracted via ECF to the Northern District of California. (gh, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of California. (MDL 2741 CTO 163 Judge Vince Chhabria) (gh, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PETER SAVVIS. MONSANTO COMPANY waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (SOLOMON, ROBERT)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 9, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9948445) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PETER SAVVIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL 2471 TRANSFER ORDER, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(SOLOMON, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAVVIS et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER SAVVIS
Represented By: ROBERT A. SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA SAVVIS
Represented By: ROBERT A. SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?