ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT v. HOLDEN et al
Plaintiff: ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT
Defendant: STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, MARGUERITE T. SIMON and ERIC H. JASO
Case Number: 3:2019cv17912
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER that all deadlines in this matter are held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. Defendants shall submit a status report to the Court, on or before 12/20/2019, with a proposed schedule on how this matter should proceed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/08/2019. (jdb)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT ORDER that the Act is preliminarily enjoined insofar as it imposes any legal requirement on any independent expenditure committee, including IOPand their employees or agents; IOP shall not be required to take any action related to the Act prior to the date on which the Court removes the preliminary injunction, or the effective date of any implementing rules promulgated by ELEC,whichever is earlier; Should Defendants seek to end the preliminary injunction, they shall notifyIOP. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/23/2019. (jdb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Marguerite T. Simon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Eric H. Jaso (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT as to Stephen M. Holden (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of All Defendants (MASEF, ADAM)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART MARK FEINBLATT on behalf of All Defendants (FEINBLATT, STUART)
September 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Daniel R. Suhr and Brian K. Kelsey: $ 300, receipt number TRE105994 (abr)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - The pending #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held in abeyance until the Court has rendered a decision on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending in Americans for Prosperity v. Grewal, 3:19-cv-14228. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/17/19. (Fiore, J)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Case Management Conference held on 9/17/2019. (Court Reporter: Not on the record.) (DS)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel R. Suhr, Esq. and Brian K. Kelsey, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/16/2019. (jjc, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel R. Suhr, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/16/2019. (jem)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Mark R. Scirocco re #6 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Mark R. Scirocco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
September 13, 2019 Notice of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti, the conference will immediately follow Oral Argument re Americans for Prosperity in civil action no. 19-14228(BRM) which has been set for 9/17/2019 @10am. Further directed plaintiff to notify his or her adversary of the court proceeding. Please confirm receipt of court notice by e-filing letter on CM/ECF not later than Monday, 9/16/2019 by 12pm. (DS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, #3 Exhibit Exhibit One, #4 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Besler, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Mark Scirocco, #2 Certification Certification of Daniel R. Suhr, #3 Certification Certification of Brian K. Kelsey, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SCIROCCO, MARK)
September 12, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (SCIROCCO, MARK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEPHEN M. HOLDEN, ERIC H. JASO, MARGUERITE T. SIMON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9956720), filed by ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification L.Civ.R.11.2 Certification)(SCIROCCO, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT v. HOLDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT
Represented By: MARK R. SCIROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN M. HOLDEN
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGUERITE T. SIMON
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H. JASO
Represented By: STUART MARK FEINBLATT
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?