TOWNSHIP OF BRICK v. PURDUE PHARMA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF BRICK
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ACTAVIS TOTOWA LLC, PURDUE PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ALLERGAN, INC., ALLERGAN FINANCE. LLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS SOUTH ATLANTIC LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC LLC, ACTAVIS LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC., F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-SALT LAKE CITY, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACUETICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT BRAND PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS KADIAN LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. K/N/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SPECGX LLC, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC., MALLINCKRODT, PLC, JANE DOES (1-50), RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., ALLERGAN USA, INC., ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., ALLERGAN PLC, THE PERDUE FREDERICK COMPANY INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., ALLERGAN FINANCE and ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACUETICALS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv17998
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45924, filed 11/01/2019. (dm )
October 21, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dm )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-115) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dm )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACUETICALS, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS KADIAN LLC, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS SOUTH ATLANTIC LLC, ACTAVIS TOTOWA LLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE, ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT BRAND PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT, PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., SPECGX LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC., THE PERDUE FREDERICK COMPANY INC., WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
September 16, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, ACTAVIS KADIAN LLC, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC., F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-SALT LAKE CITY, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS SOUTH ATLANTIC LLC, ACTAVIS TOTOWA LLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE. LLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ALLERGAN, INC., ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANE DOES (1-50), JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. K/N/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT BRAND PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT, PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACUETICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., SPECGX LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC., WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9963601) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TOWNSHIP OF BRICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOWNSHIP OF BRICK v. PURDUE PHARMA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS TOTOWA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC F/K/A ALLERGAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE. LLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS SOUTH ATLANTIC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC., F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-SALT LAKE CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACUETICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT BRAND PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS KADIAN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. K/N/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC., F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES (1-50)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PERDUE FREDERICK COMPANY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN FINANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACUETICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWNSHIP OF BRICK
Represented By: PETER W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?