SANTORELLA et al v. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: LISA PRISINZANO, STEPHANIE HARRIS, RICHARD HARRIS, KASSIE BENSON, MICHAEL BURKE, MARY SANTORELLA and STEPHANIE FRASIER
Defendant: CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC and BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv18146
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD A. ECKLUND on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ECKLUND, DONALD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRALI V. PATEL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PATEL, CHIRALI)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MAKHAIL, MARK)
November 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Loren H. Brown, Esq. and Christopher M. Young, Esq.: $ 300, receipt number TRE107149 (mg)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Loren H. Brown and Christopher M. Young. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/24/2019. (jmh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER correcting caption of this complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/16/2019. (jmh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/15/2019. (jmh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA LAUFER CAMELOTTO on behalf of CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (CAMELOTTO, AMANDA)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER M. STRONGOSKY on behalf of CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (STRONGOSKY, CHRISTOPHER)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Steve W. Berman, Jason A. Zweig, and Zoran Tasic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/15/2019. (jmh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (STRONGOSKY, CHRISTOPHER)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DURAISWAMY, SHANKAR)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANKAR DURAISWAMY on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (DURAISWAMY, SHANKAR)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Correcting Caption re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEPHANIE HARRIS, MICHAEL BURKE, RICHARD HARRIS, MARY SANTORELLA, KASSIE BENSON, LISA PRISINZANO. CHATTEM, INC. served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
September 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey H. Taylor, #2 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #3 Declaration of Jason A. Zweig, #4 Declaration of Zoran Tasic, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
September 20, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
September 20, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9976862) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STEPHANIE HARRIS, MICHAEL BURKE, RICHARD HARRIS, MARY SANTORELLA, LISA PRISINZANO.(CECCHI, JAMES) Modified on 9/20/2019 (jdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANTORELLA et al v. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA PRISINZANO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DONALD A. ECKLUND
Represented By: CHIRALI V. PATEL
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HARRIS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HARRIS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DONALD A. ECKLUND
Represented By: CHIRALI V. PATEL
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KASSIE BENSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DONALD A. ECKLUND
Represented By: CHIRALI V. PATEL
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BURKE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DONALD A. ECKLUND
Represented By: CHIRALI V. PATEL
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY SANTORELLA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DONALD A. ECKLUND
Represented By: CHIRALI V. PATEL
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE FRASIER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: DONALD A. ECKLUND
Represented By: CHIRALI V. PATEL
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATTEM, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA LAUFER CAMELOTTO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. STRONGOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Represented By: AMANDA LAUFER CAMELOTTO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. STRONGOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: AMANDA LAUFER CAMELOTTO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. STRONGOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: SHANKAR DURAISWAMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?