TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC v. O.O4 ACRES OF PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.38 ACRES OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF OLD BRIDGE et al
Plaintiff: TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: Bruce Carta, Diane Hollasch, 0.04 Acres Of Permanent Easement and 1.38 Acres Of Temporary Easement In The Township Of Old Bridge, Middlesex County, New Jersey, R.D.K. Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, Laura Carta, Kathy Mairella, O.O4 ACRES OF PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.38 ACRES OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF OLD BRIDGE and R.D.K INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv18366
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Christine A. Roy re Set/Reset Hearings, #4 Order to Show Cause,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 18, 2019 Notice of Hearing: Show Cause Hearing re [Doc. #1] reset for 12/4/2019 @10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Any party wishing to be heard to contact the Court and Plaintiffs attorney by 11/26/2019.(DS)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Kathleen Mairella. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/14/2019. (jmh)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Dianne Hollasch. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/14/2019. (jmh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant, Kathleen Mairella (Kathy Mairella) by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal As to Defendant, Diane Hollasch by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. KATHY MAIRELLA served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. DIANE HOLLASCH served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. BRUCE CARTA served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. LAURA CARTA served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (ROY, CHRISTINE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. R.D.K INC. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (ROY, CHRISTINE)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti; Any party wishing to be heard to contact the Court and Plaintiffs attorney by 11/12/2019, Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/24/2019. (jmh) Modified on 11/13/2019 (eaj, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRUCE CARTA, LAURA CARTA, DIANE HOLLASCH, KATHY MAIRELLA, O.O4 ACRES OF PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.38 ACRES OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF OLD BRIDGE, R.D.K INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
September 26, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
September 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. (ROY, CHRISTINE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9989857), filed by TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Filing Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Condemnation, #4 Brief, #5 Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ROY, CHRISTINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC v. O.O4 ACRES OF PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.38 ACRES OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF OLD BRIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Carta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Hollasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.04 Acres Of Permanent Easement and 1.38 Acres Of Temporary Easement In The Township Of Old Bridge, Middlesex County, New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D.K. Inc., a New Jersey Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Carta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Mairella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.O4 ACRES OF PERMANENT EASEMENT AND 1.38 ACRES OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT IN THE TOWNSHIP OF OLD BRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D.K INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSCONTINENTAL GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTINE A. ROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?