BLEDSOE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: DAVID BLEDSOE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv18798
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16)(CURRY, MELISSA)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA KAY CURRY on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (CURRY, MELISSA)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID BLEDSOE. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on General Counsel, #2 Proof of Service on U S Attorney General, #3 Proof of Service on U S Attty Carpenito)(MELLO, TIMOTHY)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
October 9, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp added. (abr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10021693), filed by DAVID BLEDSOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(MELLO, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLEDSOE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: MELISSA KAY CURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BLEDSOE
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH MELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?