PERRY et al v. UPROXX, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CRAWLSPACE INTERACTIVE LLC and RYAN PERRY
Defendant: WOVEXX SUBSIDIARY, INC., WOVEXX HOLDINGS, INC., JARETT MYER, WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., MULTIPLIER CAPITAL, L.P., UPROXX, LLC, BENJAMIN BLANK and SPLITTING FOURS PRODUCTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv18868
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Leo Plotkin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10152357.) (VANN, JOSEPH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Asal Akhondzadeh to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10152288.) (VANN, JOSEPH)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/03/2019. (jem)
December 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ASAL AKHONDZADEH and LEO PLOTKIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UPROXX, LLC, WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEKEL, ANNE)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Defendant's request #11 for an extension of time is DENIED as moot; Plaintiffs may attempt service again or appeal the Clerk's Office's decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/26/2019. (jem)
November 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #9 Request for Default submitted by Jeremy Klausner, Esq. on 11/21/2019 cannot be granted as requested because Defendants were not properly served pursuant to Federal Rule 4. The request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint has been referred to chambers. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jem)
November 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Iram P. Valentin, Esq. re #12 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VALENTIN, IRAM)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Jeremy Klausner re #11 Letter. (KLAUSNER, JEREMY)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Iram P. Valentin, Esq. re #9 Request for Default. (VALENTIN, IRAM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by IRAM PAGAN VALENTIN on behalf of BENJAMIN BLANK, JARETT MYER, SPLITTING FOURS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, WOVEXX HOLDINGS, INC., WOVEXX SUBSIDIARY, INC. (VALENTIN, IRAM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Default by CRAWLSPACE INTERACTIVE LLC, RYAN PERRY against Wovexx Holdings, Inc.. (KLAUSNER, JEREMY)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRAWLSPACE INTERACTIVE LLC, RYAN PERRY. UPROXX, LLC served on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/2/2019; WOVEXX HOLDINGS, INC. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (KLAUSNER, JEREMY)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Asal Akhondzadeh, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/21/2019. (jem)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as Leo D. Plotkin, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/21/2019. (jem)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Joseph M. Vann. (VANN, JOSEPH)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. VANN on behalf of MULTIPLIER CAPITAL, L.P. (VANN, JOSEPH)
November 17, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., UPROXX, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/02/2019. (jem)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney ANNE B. SEKEL for UPROXX, LLC,ANNE B. SEKEL for WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. added. (SEKEL, ANNE)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BENJAMIN BLANK, MULTIPLIER CAPITAL, L.P., JARETT MYER, SPLITTING FOURS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, UPROXX, LLC, WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WOVEXX HOLDINGS, INC., WOVEXX SUBSIDIARY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN BLANK, MULTIPLIER CAPITAL, L.P., JARETT MYER, SPLITTING FOURS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, UPROXX, LLC, WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP., WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. D/B/A ULTRA ACQUISITION, LLC, WOVEXX HOLDINGS, INC., WOVEXX SUBSIDIARY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10028235), filed by CRAWLSPACE LLC, RYAN PERRY.(KLAUSNER, JEREMY)
October 10, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRY et al v. UPROXX, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAWLSPACE INTERACTIVE LLC
Represented By: JEREMY M. KLAUSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN PERRY
Represented By: JEREMY M. KLAUSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOVEXX SUBSIDIARY, INC.
Represented By: IRAM PAGAN VALENTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOVEXX HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: IRAM PAGAN VALENTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARETT MYER
Represented By: IRAM PAGAN VALENTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP.
Represented By: ANNE B. SEKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIPLIER CAPITAL, L.P.
Represented By: JOSEPH M. VANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPROXX, LLC
Represented By: ANNE B. SEKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN BLANK
Represented By: IRAM PAGAN VALENTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPLITTING FOURS PRODUCTIONS, LLC
Represented By: IRAM PAGAN VALENTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?