Safier-Kaplan et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Carol A Safier-Kaplan and MURRAY KAPLAN
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv19102
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07169. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/11/2019) (sjo)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Having received notification from Plaintiffs that this case is expected to be transferred to the multidistrict litigation court, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference and joint submission deadline are ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/27/2019) (cf)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth in this Order). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/6/2019) (kv)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all pa1iies are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 11:40 a.m., on October 8, 2019, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. (as further set fort in this Order). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/6/2019) (kv)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Alan Goldstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17348431)Document filed by Carol A Safier-Kaplan, Murray Kaplan.(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safier-Kaplan et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A Safier-Kaplan
Represented By: Brian Alan Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURRAY KAPLAN
Represented By: Brian Alan Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?