CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY v. FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 and FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv19251
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 1/7/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/4/19. (if, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC..(WRIGHT, GEORGE)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing complaint counts I and III only without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/29/2019. (jdb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Complaint Counts I and III only by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PERRY, EDMUND)
October 24, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -EDMUND PERRY appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr)
October 24, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. identifying Fedex Freight Corporation and FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. from NJ Superior Court, Middlesex County, Law Division, case number MID-L-6543-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10055781), filed by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WRIGHT, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY v. FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: EDMUND P. PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?