CHAMBERS v. WAL-MART STORES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA CHAMBERS
Defendant: WAL-MART SUPERCENTER STORE NO. 05012, XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, WAL-MART STORES, INC. and ABC CORPORATION 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv19545
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call. Fact Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/20/2019. (jmh)
December 19, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/19/2019. (ce3)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Nada Peters, Esq. regarding Initial Conference. (PETERS, NADA)
November 12, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 A.M. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART STORES, INC., WAL-MART SUPERCENTER STORE NO. 05012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA)
October 30, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES, INC., WAL-MART SUPERCENTER STORE NO. 05012. (PETERS, NADA)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAL-MART SUPERCENTER STORE NO. 05012, WAL-MART STORES, INC. from Mercer County Superior Court, case number MER-L-001902-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10072751), filed by WAL-MART SUPERCENTER STORE NO. 05012, WAL-MART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 Exhibit B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #3 Exhibit C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(PETERS, NADA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAMBERS v. WAL-MART STORES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART SUPERCENTER STORE NO. 05012
Represented By: NADA MAALOUF PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Represented By: NADA MAALOUF PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA CHAMBERS
Represented By: CLIFFORD D. BIDLINGMAIER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?