O'MELIA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JONATHAN O'MELIA
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv19811
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JONATHAN O'MELIA. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of service on U S Atty Carpenito, #2 Proof of service of General Counsel, #3 Proof of Service on U S Attorney General)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court refund the Plaintiffs counsel the filing fee previously collected. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/09/2019. (jdb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Plaintiff with attached Proposed Order Granting IFP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
December 5, 2019 COMPLAINT filed; See docket entry #1 . (abr)
December 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TRE107965 (abr)
November 4, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti added. (abr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'MELIA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN O'MELIA
Represented By: LAUREN S. TOVINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?