JEFFREY v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: PATRICK JEFFREY
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 3:2019cv19949
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/18/2019. (jem)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint extend time to file response by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (HOHN, RICHARD)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. MCALEE on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (MCALEE, JOSEPH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD KENYON HOHN on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (HOHN, RICHARD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PATRICK JEFFREY. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (DUCKWORTH, JAMES)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
November 8, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10094883) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICK JEFFREY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(DUCKWORTH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEFFREY v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: RICHARD KENYON HOHN
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MCALEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK JEFFREY
Represented By: JAMES M. DUCKWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?