Maxwell v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Maxwell
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv19987
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01082. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #37. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2750 Invokana (Canagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
November 8, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 11/14/2019. (hmr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from P. Michael Shanley, Esq. for Beverly Maxwell requesting extension of time to serve Summons and Complaint on Defendant, Johnson & Johnson submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shanley, P.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Sheriff's Return of Service served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on October 24, 2019, filed by Beverly Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shanley, P.)
November 1, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: The 60 day time frame within which the Summons, Complaint, and G. O. 25 Filing Order were to be served upon the defendants has expired. Plaintiff is to advise the court of the status of this action IN WRITING by 11/8/2019. If service has been completed, proper proof of such service shall be filed. If service has not been completed, plaintiff may submit a written request for an extension of such time. (nmk)
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint: Clerk replaced the main document to this docket entry with a corrected version. The original filing contained 2 page #1. Clerk confirmed with Attorney Shanley who stated that is was an oversight and to go ahead and correct the document. (hmr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/25/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)(hmr)
August 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4856666) filed by Beverly Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/9/2019) (hmr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Maxwell
Represented By: P. Michael Shanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?