MARTIN v. NORRIS
Plaintiff: TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN
Defendant: JEFFREY NORRIS
Case Number: 3:2019cv20116
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Submission filed by Tekeema Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmh)
December 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to be Released from Custody. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to be Released from Custody filed by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jmh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Submission received from Tekeema Martin. (jmh)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this case, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, she shall notify the Court, in writing, within 30 days of the date of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff shall include either (1) a complete, signed in forma pauperis application, or (2) the $400 fee including the $350 filing fee plus the $50 administrative fee. A blank IFP application has been sent to Plaintiff via USPS on 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/25/2019. (jmh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 INVESTIGATION REPORT, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Envelope, #9 Exhibit)(mg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/13/2019) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #10 Application IFP) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. NORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY NORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?