MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. PIRONE et al
Plaintiff: MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ANTONIO PIRONE, THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL REISS and ELISABETH REISS
Case Number: 3:2019cv20366
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibits)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 19, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
December 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ELISABETH REISS, THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL REISS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(SANSONE, NICHOLAS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. ELISABETH REISS served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL REISS served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. ANTONIO PIRONE served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTONIO PIRONE, ELISABETH REISS, THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL REISS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
November 15, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANTONIO PIRONE, ELISABETH REISS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10114510) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. PIRONE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO PIRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL REISS
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. SANSONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH REISS
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. SANSONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GAETANO MERCOGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?