ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. v. QUOTIENT SUISSE SA et al
Plaintiff: ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Defendant: QUOTIENT SUISSE SA and QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED
Case Number: 3:2019cv20470
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/27/2019. (jmh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (DERMAN, ADAM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne E. Thompson: Oral argument re: Preliminary Injunction and Settlement conference held on 12/20/2019. (Court Recorder K. McGONIGLE.) (adi, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF Reply Brief In Further Support Of Application For Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Bob Stowers)(DERMAN, ADAM)
December 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Anthony M. Candido, Esq. and John Alexander, Esq. $ 300, receipt number NEW041327. (sms)
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Anthony M. Candido re #14 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction by QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED, QUOTIENT SUISSE SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(BERMAN, MARK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Edward Farrell re #14 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction by QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED, QUOTIENT SUISSE SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(BERMAN, MARK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction (BERMAN, MARK)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Anthony M. Candido, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/09/2019. (jem)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to John Alexander, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/09/2019. (jem)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; QUOTIENT SUISSE SA waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (DERMAN, ADAM)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that any opposition to Plaintiff's application for a Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by Defendants by 12/12/2019; any response shall be filed by Plaintiff by 12/17/2019; oral argument on Plaintiff's application is set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00am. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/26/2019. (jem)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne E. Thompson: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/22/2019. Defendants response is due 12/12/2019. Plaintiffs reply is due 12/17/2019. Oral argument is set for 12/20/2019 at 10 am. in Trenton - Courtroom 4W before Judge Anne E. Thompson. (Court Recorder K. McGONIGLE.) (adi, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. BERMAN on behalf of QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED, QUOTIENT SUISSE SA (BERMAN, MARK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Mark A. Berman, Esq. re Plaintiff request for TRO re #6 Letter. (BERMAN, MARK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Adam K. Derman to The Honorable Anne E. Thompson, U.S.D.J. Re: The November 18th Filing. (DERMAN, ADAM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. O'NEILL on behalf of ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (O'NEILL, BRIAN)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIE L. MATHEWS on behalf of ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. (MATHEWS, MARIE)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED, QUOTIENT SUISSE SA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. identifying The Carlyle Group as Corporate Parent.. (DERMAN, ADAM)
November 19, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10119922), filed by ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint Ex. A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Verified Complaint Ex. A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit Verified Complaint Ex. A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit Verified Complaint Exs. B to O, #5 Brief Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #7 Certification A.Derman Certification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(DERMAN, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. v. QUOTIENT SUISSE SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUOTIENT SUISSE SA
Represented By: MARK A. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBD (QS-IP) LIMITED
Represented By: MARK A. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Represented By: ADAM K. DERMAN
Represented By: BRIAN P. O'NEILL
Represented By: MARIE L. MATHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?