GIDDENS v. THE CITY OF TRENTON et al
Plaintiff: RAVEENA GIDDENS
Defendant: THE TRENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, POLICE DIRECTOR SHEILAH COLEY, OFFICER SHEILA TATAREK, LIEUTENANT RICHARD FINK, THE CITY OF TRENTON, CAPTAIN JAMES SLACK, Former DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA, DETECTIVE SERGEANT GAETANO PONTICIELLO, SERGEANT SHEILA TATAREK, JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-10) and POLICE DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA
Case Number: 3:2019cv21743
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAVEENA GIDDENS. POLICE DIRECTOR SHEILAH COLEY waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; LIEUTENANT RICHARD FINK waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-10) waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; POLICE DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; DETECTIVE SERGEANT GAETANO PONTICIELLO waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; CAPTAIN JAMES SLACK waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; SHEILA TATAREK waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; THE CITY OF TRENTON waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; THE TRENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (WHALEN, PATRICK)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to POLICE DIRECTOR SHEILAH COLEY, LIEUTENANT RICHARD FINK, POLICE DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA, DETECTIVE SERGEANT GAETANO PONTICIELLO, CAPTAIN JAMES SLACK, SHEILA TATAREK, THE CITY OF TRENTON, THE TRENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
December 23, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against POLICE DIRECTOR SHEILAH COLEY, LIEUTENANT RICHARD FINK, Former DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA, DETECTIVE SERGEANT GAETANO PONTICIELLO, CAPTAIN JAMES SLACK, SHEILA TATAREK, THE CITY OF TRENTON, THE TRENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10198402) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RAVEENA GIDDENS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WHALEN, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIDDENS v. THE CITY OF TRENTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE DIRECTOR SHEILAH COLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER SHEILA TATAREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT RICHARD FINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF TRENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN JAMES SLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE SERGEANT GAETANO PONTICIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT SHEILA TATAREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE DIRECTOR PEDRO MEDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVEENA GIDDENS
Represented By: PATRICK J. WHALEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?