Abram et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Doris Stangl, Mable Hudgins, Debra Kubanek, Kathy Tripp, MARIA MENDEZ, Cindy Donnelly, Maria Gentile, LISA JOHNSON, Mackie Chesnutt, Edwina Abram, Kristen Willis, Denise Edwards, Priscilla Cook, Marion DiMarzo, Karen Burnett, Elizabeth Roper, Yolanda Green-Hines, Joyce Sturman, Brenda Stewart, Mary Glassstang, Roseanne Rogach, Andrea Melanson, Julie Costa, Lanette Woolen, Mary Iva Jones, Maryann Jeffrey, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Diana Dooley, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Steven Arnett, ESQ. SCOTT BAKER, Kathy Guity, Kimberly Bright, Debra Reuter, Alfred Walters, Decarla Jones, Dorothy Ray Williams, Juliet Mitchell, Billie Whitlow, Gayla Germany, Tami Caballero, Ethel Marshall, William Guard, Donna Murray, JUDITH MARTEN, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Delores Firth, Denice Bailey, Maudester Hardin, Jesslyn Meeks, Michael Clements, Shirley Danek, DIANE JOHNSON, Joanie Shawhan, Diane Palermo, Mary Ann Johnson, Cathey Vaughn, Venessa Jordan, Carolyn Cotcamp, Graciela Sissine, PATRICIA CLARK, Kim Freeman, Jonelle Kann, PHV MICHELLE HERRERA, Mary Kate Palmer, Michele Dahl, Bonnie Holubik, Frances Kurdes, Roberta Conley, Patrice Thomas, Jessica Bojorquez, Mara Williams, Candace Craig, THE ESTATE OF HELLENA LEE, THE ESTATE OF AMY CLEMENTS, THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH HARDESTY, THE ESTATE OF LOUISA GUARD, THE ESTATE OF THOMASCENE WALTERS and THE ESTATE OH JUDITH PETTIT
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, PTI Union, LLC, CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION and PTI Royston, LLC
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv01276
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #98 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant PTI Royston's Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #101 MOTION to Seal Document #100 Exhibit (to Document),,,,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to PTI Royston's Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #97 MOTION to Seal Document #96 Exhibit (to Document),,,,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to PTI Union's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 23, 2020 Filing 102 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #77 MOTION to Remand Plaintiffs' Reply to the J&J Defendants' Memo of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
March 23, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION to Seal Document #100 Exhibit (to Document),,,,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to PTI Royston's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
March 23, 2020 Filing 100 Exhibit to #99 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to PTI Royston's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39, #32 Exhibit 45)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 23, 2020 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 46, #15 Exhibit 47, #16 Exhibit 48)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
March 23, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant PTI Royston's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
March 23, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION to Seal Document #96 Exhibit (to Document),,,,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to PTI Union's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
March 23, 2020 Filing 96 Exhibit to #95 Response in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to PTI Union's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39, #32 Exhibit 45)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 23, 2020 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #89 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by PTI Union (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 94 Letter from Caroline M. Tinsley to Hon. Freda L. Wolfson re Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC and Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Joinder re #92 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
March 12, 2020 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION re #77 MOTION to Remand (SILVER, MARK)
March 12, 2020 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. re #77 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jessica L. Brennan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 10, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Union, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
March 10, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Royston, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
March 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #89 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 4/6/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #88 MOTION to Seal Document #87 Exhibit (to Document),, Motion to Seal Exhibit F, Submitted in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Cla. Motion set for 4/6/2020 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION to Seal Document #87 Exhibit (to Document),, Motion to Seal Exhibit F, Submitted in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 87 Exhibit to #86 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Exhibit F by PTI Royston, LLC. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 9, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 85 Letter from Caroline M. Tinsley to Hon. Freda L. Wolfson re Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Request for Leave to File Brief in Support of its Renewed Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limit. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
February 13, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION (SILVER, MARK)
February 13, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY (SILVER, MARK)
February 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #81 MOTION to Seal Document #80 Exhibit (to Document),,,,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand. Motion set for 3/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
February 11, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Seal Document #80 Exhibit (to Document),,,,, Exhibits Filed Under Seal to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 80 Exhibit to #79 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, Filed Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 39, #31 Exhibit 40, #32 Exhibit 44, #33 Exhibit 45, #34 Exhibit 46, #35 Exhibit 47, #36 Exhibit 48, #37 Exhibit 49, #38 Exhibit 50, #39 Exhibit 51, #40 Exhibit 52, #41 Exhibit 53, #42 Exhibit 54)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 11, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #77 MOTION to Remand , #78 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Memorandum of Law in Support of Remand. Motion set for 3/16/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #77 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 38, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 55, #14 Exhibit 56, #15 Exhibit 57, #16 Exhibit 58, #17 Exhibit 59, #18 Exhibit 60, #19 Exhibit 61, #20 Exhibit 62, #21 Exhibit 63, #22 Exhibit 64)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Memorandum of Law in Support of Remand by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
February 10, 2020 Filing 76 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, )
February 6, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
February 6, 2020 Filing 75 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02711. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
February 5, 2020 Filing 73 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB)
October 28, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Mines Corporation) filed by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
October 28, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
October 28, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Amax Minerals Company) filed by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
October 28, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
October 25, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Joinder in #64 Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants PTI Royston, LLC, PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 25, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Joinder in #63 Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants PTI Royston, LLC, PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 25, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 25, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 25, 2019 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Rankin, W.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Hearing re #41 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #41 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rankin, W.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation - Defendants Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document - Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 21, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 18, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rankin, W.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Mines Corporation) by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cyprus Amax Minerals Company) by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #37 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Hearing re #41 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, Exhibit H Filed Under Seal by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, Exhibit F Filed Under Seal by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, Exhibit D Filed Under Seal by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, Exhibit C Filed Under Seal by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, Exhibit B Filed Under Seal by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 45 SEALED DOCUMENT re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, Exhibit A Filed Under Seal by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re Exhibits A-D, F and H to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William) **Per attorney all sealed exhibits were e-mailed to counsel of record**(EAB).
October 18, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #41 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Form H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation re Memorandum of Law in Support of Remand by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings (Opposition) filed by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Plaintiffs Edwina Abram, Steven Arnett, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Denice Bailey, Scott Baker, Jessica Bojorquez, Kimberly Bright, Karen Burnett, Tami Caballero, Mackie Chesnutt, Patricia Clark, Michael Clements, Roberta Conley, Priscilla Cook, Julie Costa, Carolyn Cotcamp, Candace Craig, Michele Dahl, Shirley Danek, Marion DiMarzo, Cindy Donnelly, Diana Dooley, Denise Edwards, Delores Firth, Kim Freeman, Maria Gentile, Gayla Germany, Mary Glassstang, Yolanda Green-Hines, William Guard, Kathy Guity, Maudester Hardin, Michelle Herrera, Bonnie Holubik, Mable Hudgins, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Maryann Jeffrey, Diane Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Mary Ann Johnson, Decarla Jones, Mary Iva Jones, Venessa Jordan, Jonelle Kann, Debra Kubanek, Frances Kurdes, Ethel Marshall, Judith Marten, Jesslyn Meeks, Andrea Melanson, Maria Mendez, Juliet Mitchell, Donna Murray, Diane Palermo, Mary Kate Palmer, Debra Reuter, Roseanne Rogach, Elizabeth Roper, Joanie Shawhan, Graciela Sissine, Doris Stangl, Brenda Stewart, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Joyce Sturman, Patrice Thomas, Kathy Tripp, Cathey Vaughn, Alfred Walters, Billie Whitlow, Dorothy Ray Williams, Mara Williams, Kristen Willis, Lanette Woolen. (Blair, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Memorandum in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT re #35 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal : Exhibit F by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit F to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F - to be submitted under seal, #8 Exhibit G)(Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State A Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John Fenn)(Walsh, Steven) Modified on 10/15/2019 (MCB).
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John Fenn)(Walsh, Steven) Modified on 10/15/2019 (MCB).
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Joinder Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Walsh, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. Parent companies: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Walsh, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. Parent companies: Freeport Minerals Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Walsh, Steven) (Main Document 19 replaced on 10/11/2019) (MCB).
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh for Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Walsh, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A. Prost for Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Prost, Mark)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Anne Mellow for Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
October 7, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 Consent to Removal by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (MFG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Consent to Removal by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (MFG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Bonnie Holubik, Michelle Herrera, Tammy Lynn Strickland, Cindy Donnelly, Dorothy Ray Williams, Kimberly Bright, Maria Gentile, Michele Dahl, Kristen Willis, Carolyn Cotcamp, Frances Kurdes, Mary Kate Palmer, Gayla Germany, Debra Reuter, Graciela Sissine, Marion DiMarzo, Mackie Chesnutt, Kathy Guity, Maryann Jeffrey, Patricia Clark, Jesslyn Meeks, Patrice Thomas, Yolanda Green-Hines, Maria Mendez, Decarla Jones, Joyce Sturman, Roseanne Rogach, Venessa Jordan, Michael Clements, Julie Costa, Juliet Mitchell, Joanie Shawhan, Brenda Stewart, Lanette Woolen, Kathy Tripp, Maudester Hardin, Shirley Danek, Doris Stangl, Diane Palermo, Cathey Vaughn, Mara Williams, Alfred Walters, Steven Arnett, Candace Craig, Edwina Abram, William Guard, Kim Freeman, Mary Glassstang, Mary Iva Jones, Priscilla Cook, Billie Whitlow, Elizabeth Roper, Andrea Melanson, Delores Firth, Donna Murray, Diana Dooley, Jonelle Kann, Ethel Marshall, Denise Edwards, Roberta Conley, Jessica Bojorquez, Peggy Lee Arroyo, Diane Johnson, Tami Caballero, Kathryn Jacobsen Meng, Judith Marten, Karen Burnett, Mary Ann Johnson, Denice Bailey, Mable Hudgins, Lisa Johnson, Debra Kubanek, Scott Baker.(MFG)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Consent to Removal by Defendant PTI ROYSTON, LLC(Rankin, W.) Modified on 10/8/2019 (BRP).
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Rankin, W.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-CC11374, with receipt number AMOEDC-7503042, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form)(Rankin, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Stangl
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mable Hudgins
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kubanek
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Tripp
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA MENDEZ
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Donnelly
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gentile
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA JOHNSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackie Chesnutt
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwina Abram
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Willis
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Edwards
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Cook
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion DiMarzo
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Burnett
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Roper
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Green-Hines
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Sturman
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Stewart
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Glassstang
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne Rogach
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Melanson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Costa
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanette Woolen
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Iva Jones
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Jeffrey
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Lee Arroyo
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Dooley
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Lynn Strickland
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Arnett
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESQ. SCOTT BAKER
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Guity
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bright
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Reuter
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Walters
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Decarla Jones
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Ray Williams
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Mitchell
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Whitlow
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayla Germany
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Caballero
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Marshall
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Guard
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Murray
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH MARTEN
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Jacobsen Meng
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Firth
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denice Bailey
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maudester Hardin
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesslyn Meeks
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clements
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Danek
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE JOHNSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanie Shawhan
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Palermo
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Johnson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathey Vaughn
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venessa Jordan
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Cotcamp
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Sissine
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA CLARK
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Freeman
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonelle Kann
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHV MICHELLE HERRERA
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kate Palmer
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Dahl
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Holubik
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Kurdes
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Conley
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Thomas
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bojorquez
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mara Williams
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Craig
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Represented By: JAMES G. ONDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF HELLENA LEE
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF AMY CLEMENTS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH HARDESTY
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF LOUISA GUARD
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF THOMASCENE WALTERS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OH JUDITH PETTIT
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Represented By: MARY ANNE MELLOW
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: MARK A. PROST
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION
Represented By: MARY ANNE MELLOW
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: MARK A. PROST
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?