TOSCANO v. SPEEDWAY LLC et al
Plaintiff: CRAIG TOSCANO
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-5, SPEEDWAY LLC and JOHN DOE 1-5
Case Number: 3:2020cv01298
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties due by 7/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/30/2020. (jem)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by SPEEDWAY LLC.(BUTLER, TOBIN)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney EDWARD P. SHAMY, JR terminated. Attorney PATRICIA M. LOVE for CRAIG TOSCANO added.. (LOVE, PATRICIA)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: The Initial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will now be held via telephone. (Attachment: Conference call instructions) (ce3)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/18/2020. (ce3)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY LLC. (BUTLER, TOBIN)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against SPEEDWAY LLC by SPEEDWAY LLC.(BUTLER, TOBIN)
February 7, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPEEDWAY LLC from Middlesex County Superior Court, case number MID-L-8322-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10381849), filed by SPEEDWAY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(BUTLER, TOBIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOSCANO v. SPEEDWAY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG TOSCANO
Represented By: EDWARD P. SHAMY, JR.
Represented By: PATRICIA M. LOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By: TOBIN A. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?