Doe v. Rooney
Petitioner: JOHN DOE
Respondent: Gay Gilbert, New Jersey Department of Labor, Division of Unemployment Insurance, Naomi Berry-Perez, Gregory Castellani, Jim Garner, Nancy M. Rooney and Ronald Marino
Case Number: 3:2020cv01573
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration. Plaintiff is directed to either pay the $400 filing fee, or submit the appropriate IFP application to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs within 20 days from the date of this Order. If the SDNY grants Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration and finds that this matter was improperly transferred to this District, the Court will re-transfer the case. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 03/20/2020. (jdb)
March 20, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Court doesn't accept #9 faxed submissions. If you wish to receive hard copies of documents, then the Court REQUIRES an updated address. Please notify the Court with any changes in your address. If you wish to receive notifications electronically, then you must submit a Pro se (Non Prisoner) Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically. (jdb)
March 20, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration. Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration by JOHN DOE. (jdb)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to pay the $400 filing fee, or submit the appropriate IFP application to proceed without prepayment of fees or cost within 20 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 02/25/2020. (jdb)
February 13, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00932. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (rjm)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Clerk of Court is further directed to deliver a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed anonymously or to proceed further without prepayment of fees are determinations to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/5/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
February 4, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed by Pseudonym re: #2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus & Prohibition (Order to Show Cause). Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS & PROHIBITION (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) against Naomi Berry-Perez, Gregory Castellani, Jim Garner, Gay Gilbert, Ronald Marino, New Jersey Department of Labor, Division of Unemployment Insurance, Nancy M. Rooney. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by John Doe. (sac)
February 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New Jersey Department of Labor, Division of Unemployment Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Naomi Berry-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Castellani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nancy M. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?