Y.G. et al v. Jackson School District
Plaintiff: Y.G
Defendant: Jackson School District
Case Number: 3:2020cv02887
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Y.G re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Abstain, in Part, Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Parents, #2 Certification COS)(INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Y.G re #5 First MOTION to Expedite (INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Abstain, in Part, Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint by JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT. Responses due by 5/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Abstain, in Part, Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint. Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT. Amendment to #10 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, for Emergency Relief #5 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne R. Myers, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 2-3, #5 Exhibit 4-9, #6 Exhibit 10-15, #7 Exhibit 16-20, #8 Exhibit 21-24, #9 Exhibit 25-26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28-30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit D, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT re #5 First MOTION to Expedite (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne R. Myers, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, Certification of Dr. Sajjad A. Zaidi, M.D., #3 Exhibit A, Taylor Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 and 3, #5 Exhibit 4 through 9, #6 Exhibit 10 through 15, #7 Exhibit 16 through 20, #8 Exhibit 21 through 24, #9 Exhibit 25 and 26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28 through 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit D, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER granting the request that the #5 Motion to Expedite be extended until 5/04/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/03/2020. (jem)
April 3, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Expedite . Motion reset for 5/4/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to 5.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
April 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Letter Requesting Clerks Extension under LR 6.1 filed by Anne Myers on 03/30/2020 was submitted using the incorrect event. Please resubmit using the Event - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order that can be found under Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Requesting Clerk Extension under LR 6.1 re #5 First MOTION to Expedite . (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MYERS, ANNE)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT. JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
March 18, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Expedite . Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Expedite by Y.G. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief-Memo, #2 Certification CERT. OF M. INZELBUCH, #3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE ROBBINS MYERS on behalf of JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JACKSON SCHOOL DISTRICT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION to Expedite by Y.G. & Y.G. o/b/o E.G.. (INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10557041), filed by Y.G. & Y.G. o/b/o E.G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification CERT. OF MII)(INZELBUCH, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: It was selected that this case has been filed AGAINST the Plaintiffs. In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
March 16, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
March 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Counsel for the defendant has been removed. He will need to file a Notice of Appearance if he is counsel of record for this case. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
March 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A Notice of Motion was not submitted with the Memorandum of Law in Support #2 submitted by Michael Inzelbuch on 3/16/2020. Also, the Memorandum of Law did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) The Motion has been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Y.G. et al v. Jackson School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.G
Represented By: MICHAEL I. INZELBUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson School District
Represented By: ANNE ROBBINS MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?