TILE, INC. v. BLAZING PRICES et al
Plaintiff: TILE, INC.
Defendant: HAMPSHIRE, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, EVERYTHINGDEALS and iHEAVEN
Case Number: 3:2020cv05653
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 58 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (abr)
May 7, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
May 7, 2020 Filing 57 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-cv-12081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 7, 2020 Filing 56 Case transferred to District of New Jersey;. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 7, 2020 Filing 55 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Order of Transfer.(Montes, Mariliz)
May 7, 2020 Filing 54 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Action on motion: granting in part and deferring a ruling on #45 Motion to Transfer Case; adopting #53 Report and Recommendations; and finding as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss. This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Loret, Magdalena)
April 10, 2020 Filing 53 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ORDER entered. Defendants' Motion to Transfer this Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or, In the Alternative, Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Docket No. #45 ) be ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. To the extent the Motion seeks transfer, this court recommends it be ALLOWED. To the extent the Motion seeks dismissal, this court recommends that a ruling be DEFERRED until the case has been transferred, and the matter can be decided by the presiding court. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2020. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 10, 2020 Filing 52 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #51 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 10, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 9, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #45 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Jersey. filed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. (Lent, Jonathan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 49 Opposition re #45 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Jersey. filed by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Otter Order, #2 Exhibit B - Coty Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 48 Request for notice of default by Tile, Inc. AS TO DEFENDANT DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR. (Nickerson, Morgan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tile, Inc.. DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Tile, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #45 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Jersey. filed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. (Lent, Jonathan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Jersey. by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 44 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Status Conference held on 2/6/2020. USMJ Dein reviews current discovery issue to preserve evidence with counsel and future scheduling; Dfts responsive pleading to amended complaint is due Monday 2/10/20, Plaintiff may file a reply to motion to dismiss, may file Rule 34 request and file motion to compel if required; counsel shall file a status report addressing briefing schedule on motion to dismiss, if the parties have reached an agreement on preservation of evidence, if limited discovery is required while any motion to dismiss is pending and proposed dates for future 16(b) conference. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Nickerson annd Lent) (Quinn, Thomas)
January 30, 2020 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING the hearing scheduled for 1/31/20 is rescheduled for 2/6/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
January 29, 2020 Filing 42 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark Berkowitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 28, 2020 Filing 41 Letter/request (non-motion) . (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Discovery Response, #2 Defendant's Discovery Response, #3 Defendant's Discovery Response, #4 Defendant's Discovery Response, #5 Defendant's Discovery Response, #6 Defendant's Discovery Response)(Nickerson, Morgan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 40 Defendants' Letter/request (non-motion) from Jonathan Lent . (Lent, Jonathan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark Berkowitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8076292 by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lent, Jonathan)
January 27, 2020 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing set for 1/31/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
January 27, 2020 Filing 37 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to 2/7/2020 to Respond to the Amended Complaint (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 24, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 7, 2020 to Respond to the Amended Complaint Unopposed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 35 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to 01/24/2020 to Respond to the Amended Complaint. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/24/2020 to Respond to the Amended Complaint Unopposed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tile, Inc. (Nickerson, Morgan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 32 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #22 Amended Complaint. Defendants: #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, and iHEAVEN Answers due by 1/17/2020. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 9, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint to Respond to the Amended Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to January 17,2020 to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint Unopposed ( Responses due by 1/23/2020) by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 30 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion to Preserve Evidence (Quinn, Thomas)
December 24, 2019 Filing 29 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:case called; Motion Hearing held on 12/24/2019 re #23 Emergency MOTION to Preserve Evidence filed by Tile, Inc. USMJ Dein hears arguments from counsel, will allow plaintiff to propound 3 interrogatories and Rule 34 requests; Dft. will take photographs of current inventory in its custody and control starting on 12/26/19; Dft. shall file response to amended complaint by 1/10/20. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Nickerson and Lent) (Quinn, Thomas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #23 Emergency MOTION to Preserve Evidence filed by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchases from Defendants)(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply. Counsel should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief (Unopposed) by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief)(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 25 Opposition re #23 Emergency MOTION to Preserve Evidence filed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Lent, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING HEARING on #23 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to Preserve Evidence: Defendants' opposition, if any, shall be filed by 12/23/2019. A hearing on the Motion is set for 12/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 18, 2019 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION to Preserve Evidence by Tile, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, iHEAVEN, filed by Tile, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Blazing Prices response to complaint due 12/19/19. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by #1 GREATEST DEALS. (Lent, Jonathan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by iHEAVEN. (Lent, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 19, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint by BLAZING PRICES.(Lent, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by iHEAVEN. (Lent, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HAMPSHIRE. (Lent, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. (Lent, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Complaint due 12/9/2019. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 9, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint Unopposed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Response to Complaint due by 11/25/19. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 25, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint Unopposed by #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN.(Lent, Jonathan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Loret, Magdalena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tile, Inc.. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Tile, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. (Loret, Magdalena)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Alternative Service by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 1/6/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to #1 GREATEST DEALS, BLAZING PRICES, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, EVERYTHINGDEALS, HAMPSHIRE, iHEAVEN. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against #1 GREATEST DEALS, HAMPSHIRE, EVERYTHINGDEALS, DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR, BLAZING PRICES, iHEAVEN Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7914105 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TILE, INC. v. BLAZING PRICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TILE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: MARK BERKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECT DISTRIBUTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1 GREATEST DEALS
Represented By: MARK BERKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAZING PRICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERYTHINGDEALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iHEAVEN
Represented By: MARK BERKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?