BIDWELL v. HOSPIRA INC. et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN BIDWELL
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, SANOFI S.A., HOSPIRA INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., AVENTIS PHARMA S.A., PFIZER INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC, SANDOZ INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC, ACTAVIS INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC doing business as WINTHROP U.S., MCKESSON CORPORATION doing business as MCKESSON PACKAGING, CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES LTD, WINTHROP U.S. and JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY DEFENDANTS #1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv06519
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., and Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/22/2020. (jem)
July 22, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SANDOZ INC. re #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant Sandoz Inc. joinder in the Opposition To Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion To Remand and Cross-Motion To Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Transfer (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
July 21, 2020 Filing 37 Proposed Order Consent by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (EDWARDS, EARYN)
July 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 20, 2020 Filing 36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification, #5 Exhibit 1 to Certification, #6 Exhibit 2 to Certification, #7 Exhibit 3 to Certification, #8 Exhibit 4 to Certification)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #35 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/31/2020. (jem)
July 17, 2020 Filing 35 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Hospira Defendants.. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/16/2020. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #33 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PFIZER INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/04/2020. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Filing 33 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney FRANCIS X. MANNING for PFIZER INC. added. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 32 Letter from Sandoz, Inc., withdrawing its, 7/14/2020, request for a consent order (Docket # 31) and submits the attached revised omnibus consent order re #31 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Revised)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
July 14, 2020 Filing 31 Letter from Sandoz requesting Consent Order that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
July 13, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on McKesson Corporation on June 29, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Pfizer, Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sandoz, Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Actavis Pharma Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Actavis LLC on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sanofi-Aventis US LLC on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Winthrop U.S. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sagent Pharmaceuticals on July 1, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON VAN NOSTRAND on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
June 26, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (MANNING, FRANCIS)
June 25, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The documents attached to the #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 and #18 Summons - Request For Issue filed by Karen Beyea-Schroeder, Esq. on 6/25/2020 were submitted incorrectly. For future reference, the document must be in Letter format identifying which parties a Summons must be issued for. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jem)
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PFIZER INC., SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, WINTHROP U.S. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to HOSPIRA INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to Winthrop U.S.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SANDOZ INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to PFIZER INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to MCKESSON CORPORATION. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to ACTAVIS LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (NORCIA, ROBERT)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Conference DEA) (ce3)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS X. MANNING on behalf of HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC (MANNING, FRANCIS)
May 29, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - KAREN HOPE BEYEA-SCHROEDER appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr)
May 29, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-003084-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10870835), filed by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(NORCIA, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIDWELL v. HOSPIRA INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA INC.
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: AARON VAN NOSTRAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC doing business as WINTHROP U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION doing business as MCKESSON PACKAGING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINTHROP U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY DEFENDANTS #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN BIDWELL
Represented By: KAREN HOPE BEYEA-SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?