THOMPSON v. CITY OF ASBURY PARK et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN H. THOMPSON
Defendant: PORTA AT ASURY PARK, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER, RICHARD ROES 1-10, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN, ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO, CITY OF ASBURY PARK, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON, PORTA ASBURY PARK, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH and ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA
Case Number: 3:2020cv06747
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Monmouth County Courthouse71 Monument ParkFreehold, NJ 07728-1266 State No: MON-L1421-20. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is deemed filed and Amended Complaint is remanded to State Court, Monmouth County, Superior Court; Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims are dismissed with prejudice; Defendants shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order to file an Answer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/15/2020. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order by ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA, ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY, CITY OF ASBURY PARK re #9 Motion Hearing,. (SEIJAS, ANTHONY)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference set for 7/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert is ADJOURNED without date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/15/2020. (JB)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Telephone Conference re Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2020 re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by STEVEN H. THOMPSON - Ordered motion granted; counsel to submit order. Case closed. (Court Reporter: Megan McKay-Soule.) (DS)
July 7, 2020 Notice of Hearing: Telephone Conference re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint set for 7/15/2020 @10:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Please confirm receipt of court notice by emailing, Dana_Sledge-Courtney@njd.uscourts.govt not later than 7/9/2020. (DS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA, ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY, CITY OF ASBURY PARK re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (SEIJAS, ANTHONY)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA, ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY, CITY OF ASBURY PARK.(SEIJAS, ANTHONY)
June 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by STEVEN H. THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Certification Certification of Michael Garcia, Esq., #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Certification of Michael Garcia, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(GARCIA, MICHAEL)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Jury Demand served on Porta Club on May 27, 2020, filed by STEVEN H. THOMPSON. (GARCIA, MICHAEL)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attached are the call-in instructions for the call. Counsel are directed to call in at the scheduled time. (Attachment: Instructions and call in information). (Attachments: #1 Call-in information)(ce3)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL GARCIA on behalf of STEVEN H. THOMPSON (GARCIA, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER, CITY OF ASBURY PARK, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH, ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE, ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/23/2020. (jem)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to City of Asbury Park, Asbury Park Police Department, Asbury Park Chief David Kelso, Asbury Park Police Officer Jesse Kendle, Asbury Park Police Officer Islam Joshua, Asbury Park Police Officer Matthew Brown, Asbury Park Police Officer Sean McGrady, Asbury Park Police Officer Michael McDonaugh, Asbury Park Police Officer A. Walker, Asbury Park Police Officer Marshawn Love, Asbury Park Police Officer Ahmed Lawson, Asbury Park Police Officer P. Donner. Attorney ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY,ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for CITY OF ASBURY PARK added. (SEIJAS, ANTHONY)
June 2, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
June 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Asbury Park Police Officer Matthew Brown, Asbury Park Police Officer Ahmed Lawson, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, Asbury Park Police Officer Jesse Kendle, Asbury Park Officer Islam Joshua, Asbury Park Police Officer A. Walker, Asbury Park Police Officer Michael McDonaugh, City of Asbury Park, Asbury Park Police Officer Sean McGrady, Asbury Park Police Officer P. Donner, Asbury Park Police Officer Marshawn Love, Asbury Park Police Chief David Kelso from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number MON-L-1421-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10888708), filed by Asbury Park Police Officer Matthew Brown, Asbury Park Police Officer Ahmed Lawson, ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, Asbury Park Police Officer Jesse Kendle, Asbury Park Officer Islam Joshua, Asbury Park Police Officer A. Walker, Asbury Park Police Officer Michael McDonaugh, City of Asbury Park, Asbury Park Police Officer Sean McGrady, Asbury Park Police Officer P. Donner, Asbury Park Police Officer Marshawn Love, Asbury Park Police Chief David Kelso.(SEIJAS, ANTHONY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON v. CITY OF ASBURY PARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTA AT ASURY PARK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER P. DONNER
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MATTHEW BROWN
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE CHIEF DAVID KELSO
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ASBURY PARK
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER JESSE KENDLE
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER A. WALKER
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MARSHAWN LOVE
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER SEAN MCGRADY
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER AHMED LAWSON
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTA ASBURY PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK POLICE OFFICER MICHAEL MCDONAUGH
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY PARK OFFICER ISLAM JOSHUA
Represented By: ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN H. THOMPSON
Represented By: MICHAEL GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?