Sumner v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Sumner
Defendant: PTI ROYSTON LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, John Doe Corporations No. 1-10, & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC., CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION and PTI ROYSTON LLC A Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv06825
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #46 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Remand. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Cheryl Sumner re #44 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Readdy Remand Order, #2 Exhibit 2: Shrodes Order, #3 Exhibit 3: Eubanks Order, #4 Exhibit 4: Snipes Order, #5 Exhibit 5: Order Granting PTI's Application, #6 Exhibit 6: Cook Order, #7 Exhibit 7: Ginsburg Order, #8 Exhibit 8: Miller Order, #9 Exhibit 9: Pace Order, #10 Exhibit 10: Sandman Order)(BEVIS, JOHN)
July 20, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Remand by Cheryl Sumner. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1: Readdy Remand Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BEVIS, JOHN)
July 7, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI ROYSTON LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
July 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #44 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PTI ROYSTON LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
June 5, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY (SILVER, MARK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT)
June 4, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 41 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00035. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2020 Filing 40 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2738). (jrb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martinez, Zoe) Modified on 4/14/2020 (jrb).
April 10, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by Cheryl Sumner re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Her Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Thrash Order of Remand)(Barnes, Roy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cheryl Sumner. (Barnes, Roy)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caroline M. Tinsley as to PTI Royston, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 03/26/2020. (JH)
March 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2808372, Fee Amount $200. (jrb)
March 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Cheryl Sumner re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #31 Response to Motion. (Barnes, Roy)
March 24, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III filed by PTI Royston, LLC filed by PTI Royston, LLC. (Marshall, David)
March 24, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2808372, Fee Amount $200, by PTI Royston, LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Marshall, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #1 Correct image) (jrb).
March 17, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss by PTI Royston, LLC. (Marshall, David)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Suson, Leslie)
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Suson, Leslie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III Plaintiff's Amended Response to Correct Deficiency per Doc. 28 filed by Cheryl Sumner. (Barnes, Roy) Modified on 3/12/2020 (jrb).
March 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/25/2020. (jrb)
March 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of filing deficiency re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jrb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III filed by Cheryl Sumner. (Barnes, Roy)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing as moot #5 Motion to Stay; granting #25 Motion to Extend Mandatory Filings deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/8/20. (jrb)
March 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mandatory Filings. (jrb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mandatory Filings , by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/19/2020. (Merritt, Julia)
March 4, 2020 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Suson, Leslie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Johnson & Johnson. (Suson, Leslie)
February 28, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Cheryl Sumner. (Barnes, Roy)
February 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Cheryl Sumner's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Barnes, Roy)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/27/2020. (loh)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/27/2020. (loh)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting re #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/27/2020. (loh)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/27/2020. (loh)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pr Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/27/2020. (loh)
February 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Cheeley Receipt Number 113J-2789676, Fee Amount $200,, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Bevis Receipt Number 113J-2789674, Fee Amount $200,, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roy E. Barnes Receipt Number 113J-2789666, Fee Amount $200,, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin R. Rosichan Receipt Number 113J-2789675, Fee Amount $200,, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia A. Merritt Receipt Number 113J-2789678, Fee Amount $200. (jrb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III by PTI Royston, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A)(Marshall, David) Modified on 2/25/2020 (jrb).
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PTI Royston, LLC identifying Broadview Investments, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Marshall, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative Dismiss Counts I-III by PTI Royston, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A)(Marshall, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 PTI Royston's ANSWER to Complaint by PTI Royston, LLC.(Marshall, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia A. Merritt Receipt Number 113J-2789678, Fee Amount $200, by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Barnes, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #3 List of Cases) (jrb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Cheeley Receipt Number 113J-2789676, Fee Amount $200, by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Barnes, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #3 List of Cases) (jrb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2020: #4 Correct main Document) (jrb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin R. Rosichan Receipt Number 113J-2789675, Fee Amount $200, by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Barnes, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #3 List of Cases) (jrb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Bevis Receipt Number 113J-2789674, Fee Amount $200, by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Barnes, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #3 List of cases) (jrb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roy E. Barnes Receipt Number 113J-2789666, Fee Amount $200, by Cheryl Sumner. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Barnes, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #3 List of Cases) (jrb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Glasgow, Julia)
February 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Responses due by 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Suson, Leslie)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Suson, Leslie)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/18/2020. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, from Superior Court of Liberty County, case number SUV2020000058. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2785466). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh) Modified on 2/18/2020 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumner v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI ROYSTON LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: David C. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: Zoe Ileana Martinez
Represented By: Leslie J. Suson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Represented By: Chad A. Schultz
Represented By: Julia Christine Glasgow
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations No. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: & JOHNSON JOHNSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: Zoe Ileana Martinez
Represented By: Leslie J. Suson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: Zoe Ileana Martinez
Represented By: Leslie J. Suson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION
Represented By: Chad A. Schultz
Represented By: Julia Christine Glasgow
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI ROYSTON LLC A Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: David C. Marshall
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Sumner
Represented By: Roy E. Barnes
Represented By: Robert David Cheeley
Represented By: JOHN R BEVIS
Represented By: Julia A Merritt
Represented By: BENJAMIN R ROSICHAN
Represented By: JOHN RAYMOND BEVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?