ANDREWS v. SANOFI S.A. et al
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS ANDREWS
Defendant: SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC. f/k/a SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC., SANDOZ, INC., SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS LLC f/k/a ACTAVIS INC., SANOFI S.A., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC formerly known as HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., PFIZER INC., AVENTIS PHARMA S.A., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. f/k/a CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, separately and doing business as WINTHROP, U.S., SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, MCKESSON CORPORATION d/b/a MCKESSON PACKAGING, HOSPIRA, INC., JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY DEFENDANTS #1-10, HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, ACTAVIS INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC., CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD., MCKESSON CORPORATION doing business as MCKESSON PACKAGING, HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC SEPARATELY AND doing business as WINTHROP U.S. and Winthrop U.S.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06834
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONSENT ORDER extending time for Defendants SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC. and SANOFI-VENTIS U.S. LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Master Short Form Complaint to 08/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/31/2020. (jdb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 32 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC re #31 Letter. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN)
July 29, 2020 Filing 31 Letter from S. Matthews (Sanofi Defendants) re Consent Order Extending Time to Answer. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER that the time for McKesson to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints are hereby extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/29/2020. (jem)
July 27, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 27, 2020 Filing 28 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension to Respond)(FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SANDOZ, INC. re #26 Cross MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant Sandoz Inc. joinder in the Opposition To Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion To Remand and Cross-Motion To Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Transfer (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
July 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #26 Cross MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 Cross MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification, #5 Exhibit 1 to Certification, #6 Exhibit 2 to Certification, #7 Exhibit 3 to Certification, #8 Exhibit 4 to Certification)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #25 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOSPIRA, INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/03/2020. (jmh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 25 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Hospira Defendants.. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/16/2020. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS ANDREWS. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Sandoz, Inc., withdrawing its, 7/14/2020, request for a consent order (Docket # 14) and submits the attached revised omnibus consent order re #14 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Revised)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Sandoz requesting Consent Order that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER granting request to postpone the 07/30 initial conference and related Rule 26 deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/13/2020. (jmh)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Francis X. Manning. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON VAN NOSTRAND on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, SANDOZ, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., Winthrop U.S.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by PHYLLIS ANDREWS as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, SANDOZ, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., Winthrop U.S.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 26, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (MANNING, FRANCIS)
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER granting Defendants' request to reschedule the Initial Conference to 07/30/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/23/2020. (jmh)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Francis X. Manning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA, INC. identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/16/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attached are the call-in instructions for the call. Counsel are directed to call in at the scheduled time. (Attachment: Instructions and call in information).(ce3)
June 4, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOSPIRA, INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC formerly known as HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number l-003174-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10899744), filed by HOSPIRA, INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC formerly known as HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certification LOCAL RULE 11.2 CERTIFICATION, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MANNING, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDREWS v. SANOFI S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC. f/k/a SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: AARON VAN NOSTRAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC f/k/a ACTAVIS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC formerly known as HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. f/k/a CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, separately and doing business as WINTHROP, U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION d/b/a MCKESSON PACKAGING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DRUG COMPANY DEFENDANTS #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI U.S. SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION doing business as MCKESSON PACKAGING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC SEPARATELY AND doing business as WINTHROP U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS ANDREWS
Represented By: KAREN HOPE BEYEA-SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?