THIEFFRY v. ROSENBERGER et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA THIEFFRY
Defendant: THOMAS J. HOPKINS, PETER BERGER, ROBERT AQUILINA, WILLIAM J. CADOGAN, ROBERT E. GARCIA, RONALD W. HOVSEPIAN, KRISTIN S. RINNE, LAURIE HARRIS, LAWRENCE IRVING, KAREN L. ROSENBERGER, FRANK BAKER, MOHAN GYANI, DONNIE M. MOORE, SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STEPHEN G. WALDIS, GLENN LURIE, JAMES M. MCCORMICK and JOHN W. FREDERICK
Case Number: 3:2020cv07224
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time by which Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 8/13/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/6/2020. (jmh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (BARTLE, HARVEY)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the date by which Defendants must answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including 08/06/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 07/08/2020. (jmh)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (BARTLE, HARVEY)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PATRICIA THIEFFRY. SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROBERT AQUILINA, FRANK BAKER, PETER BERGER, WILLIAM J. CADOGAN, JOHN W. FREDERICK, ROBERT E. GARCIA, MOHAN GYANI, LAURIE HARRIS, THOMAS J. HOPKINS, RONALD W. HOVSEPIAN, LAWRENCE IRVING, GLENN LURIE, JAMES M. MCCORMICK, DONNIE M. MOORE, KRISTIN S. RINNE, KAREN L. ROSENBERGER, SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STEPHEN G. WALDIS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 12, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PATRICIA THIEFFRY. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by PATRICIA THIEFFRY as to ROBERT AQUILINA, FRANK BAKER, PETER BERGER, WILLIAM J. CADOGAN, JOHN W. FREDERICK, ROBERT E. GARCIA, MOHAN GYANI, LAURIE HARRIS, THOMAS J. HOPKINS, RONALD W. HOVSEPIAN, LAWRENCE IRVING, GLENN LURIE, JAMES M. MCCORMICK, DONNIE M. MOORE, KRISTIN S. RINNE, KAREN L. ROSENBERGER, SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STEPHEN G. WALDIS. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT AQUILINA, FRANK BAKER, PETER BERGER, WILLIAM J. CADOGAN, JOHN W. FREDERICK, ROBERT E. GARCIA, MOHAN GYANI, LAURIE HARRIS, THOMAS J. HOPKINS, RONALD W. HOVSEPIAN, LAWRENCE IRVING, GLENN LURIE, JAMES M. MCCORMICK, DONNIE M. MOORE, KRISTIN S. RINNE, KAREN L. ROSENBERGER, SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STEPHEN G. WALDIS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10938992) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PATRICIA THIEFFRY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THIEFFRY v. ROSENBERGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT AQUILINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J. CADOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD W. HOVSEPIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIN S. RINNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURIE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE IRVING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN L. ROSENBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAN GYANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNIE M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONOSS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN G. WALDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN LURIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES M. MCCORMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN W. FREDERICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA THIEFFRY
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?