GIC PRIVATE LTD. v. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: GIC PRIVATE LTD.
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07460
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GIC PRIVATE LTD.. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 18, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10963901) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GIC PRIVATE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREENBERG, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIC PRIVATE LTD. v. VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIC PRIVATE LTD.
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?