RAVENS CREST EAST et al v. RUSSO
In Re: ROTIMI AZU OWOH
Appellant: RAVENS CREST EAST
Appellee: ALBERT RUSSO
Case Number: 3:2020cv07581
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by ROTIMI AZU OWOH re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable PETER SHERIDAN, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/26/2020. (OWOH, ROTIMI)
July 14, 2020 Set Hearings: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jdb)
July 14, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Certificate of Failure to File Designation of Record attached to docket entry #5 filed by the Clerk's office on 07/14/2020 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jdb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jdb)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, RE: Amended Transmittal. (jdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Issues to be Presented on Appeal by RAVENS CREST EAST. (SODINI, GREGG)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by RAVENS CREST EAST re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Sheridan, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/19/2020. (SODINI, GREGG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-17813-CMG, filed by RAVENS CREST EAST. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Order being Appealed, #3 Certificate of Service)(abr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAVENS CREST EAST et al v. RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ROTIMI AZU OWOH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RAVENS CREST EAST
Represented By: HUBERT C. CUTOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALBERT RUSSO
Represented By: ALBERT RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?