FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC v. OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Plaintiff: FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC and FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC doing business as ALLSTATE AUTO COLLISION
Defendant: OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07705
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Omega Flex ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by OMEGA FLEX, INC..(GREWE, ERIN)
July 7, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases for purposes of discovery and trial. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 07/07/2020. (jdb)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference will be conducted by the undersigned, at the Clarkson S. Fisher United States Courthouse, Trenton, New Jersey on December 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. A telephone status conference will be held before the undersigned on October 6, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Co. of America is to initiate the call. Fact discovery is to remain open through 12/31/2020. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed no later than 09/11/2020, and made returnable by 10/05/2020. Dispositive motions may be filed by no later than 07/23/2021, and made returnable by 08/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 07/07/2020. (jdb)
June 30, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2020 via Telephone Conference. (if, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OMEGA FLEX, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
June 24, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC D/B/A ALLSTATE AUTO COLLISION. (MACNOW, RUSSELL)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OMEGA FLEX, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10984493) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC D/B/A ALLSTATE AUTO COLLISION.(MACNOW, RUSSELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC v. OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC
Represented By: RUSSELL MACNOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST CLASS AUTO BODY, LLC doing business as ALLSTATE AUTO COLLISION
Represented By: RUSSELL MACNOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMEGA FLEX, INC.
Represented By: ERIN W. GREWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?