QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND et al
Plaintiff: QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC and QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED doing business as KIDDIE ACADAMY OF HAMILTON
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND and SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07798
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SHER, ELIZABETH)
July 15, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/04/2020. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (SHER, ELIZABETH)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH J. SHER on behalf of All Defendants (SHER, ELIZABETH)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC. SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC DBA KIDDIE ACADEMY OF HAMILTON. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND, SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10992700) with JURY DEMAND, filed by QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC DBA KIDDIE ACADEMY OF HAMILTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC v. SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW ENGLAND
Represented By: ELIZABETH J. SHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH J. SHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUAKERBRIDGE EARLY LEARNING LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED doing business as KIDDIE ACADAMY OF HAMILTON
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?