TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND et al v. MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC.
Plaintiff: REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND and EDUCATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND and NEW JERSEY COMMITTEE REPRESENTING THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Defendant: MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07823
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2020 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jem)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against Mechanical Systems Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of W. Daniel Feehan, Esquire)(FEEHAN, W.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND, NEW JERSEY COMMITTEE REPRESENTING THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND and EDUCATION FUND. MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (FEEHAN, W.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY COMMITTEE REPRESENTING THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND and EDUCATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND. (FEEHAN, W.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
June 26, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10995730), filed by TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND, NEW JERSEY COMMITTEE REPRESENTING THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND and EDUCATION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FEEHAN, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND et al v. MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND and EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING & SERVICE DIVISION (UA-NJ) PENSION FUND, WELFARE FUND, ANNUITY FUND AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY COMMITTEE REPRESENTING THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MECHANICAL SYSTEMS SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?