SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. APOTEX INC. et al
Plaintiff: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: APOTEX CORP. and APOTEX INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07870
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER- The Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer, document #11 submitted by APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. on 8/20/2020 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/8/2020. (mg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION/PETITION for the pro hac vice admission of Edgar H. Haug, Nicholas F. Giove, Andrew S. Roper, and Anna N. Lukacher for by SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of W. Baton, #2 Certification of E. Haug, #3 Certification of N. Giove, #4 Certification of A. Roper, #5 Certification of A. Lukacher, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(BATON, WILLIAM)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER LEE CALLO on behalf of SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (CALLO, ALEXANDER)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
June 26, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APOTEX CORP., APOTEX INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10999146), filed by SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(BATON, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. APOTEX INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX INC.
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?