CHAMBERS v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: RAMONA CHAMBERS
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS, ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS), JOHN DOES (1-10), defendants unknown to Plaintiff at this time and JOHN DOES (1-10)
Case Number: 3:2020cv09001
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Ordered Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/11/2020. (eh, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(BELL, ALNISA)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (BELL, ALNISA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS, THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr )
July 17, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11084269), filed by RAMONA CHAMBERS.(FABRICANT, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAMBERS v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: ALNISA S. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION # 1-10 (FICTITIOUS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10), defendants unknown to Plaintiff at this time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA CHAMBERS
Represented By: JONATHAN S. FABRICANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?