REEVES et al v. EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TROY REEVES, ERIC SWAIN, WRIGHT L MOSLEY and JAMES BELL
Defendant: EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC., JAY GORNITZKY and JOHN DOES 1-100
Case Number: 3:2020cv09058
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/18/2020. (jem)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC., JAY GORNITZKY.(DUFFY, M.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT W. KENNEALLY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KENNEALLY, SCOTT)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TROY REEVES, JAMES BELL, WRIGHT L MOSLEY, ERIC SWAIN. JAY GORNITZKY served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (STARKEY, KEVIN)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TROY REEVES, JAMES BELL, WRIGHT L MOSLEY, ERIC SWAIN. EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (STARKEY, KEVIN)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN N. STARKEY on behalf of JAMES BELL, WRIGHT L MOSLEY, TROY REEVES, ERIC SWAIN (STARKEY, KEVIN)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC., JAY GORNITZKY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
July 20, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC., JAY GORNITZKY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11090791) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TROY REEVES, JAMES BELL, WRIGHT L MOSLEY, ERIC SWAIN.(STARKEY, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REEVES et al v. EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE BLENDED PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY GORNITZKY
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY REEVES
Represented By: KEVIN N. STARKEY
Represented By: SCOTT W. KENNEALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC SWAIN
Represented By: KEVIN N. STARKEY
Represented By: SCOTT W. KENNEALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRIGHT L MOSLEY
Represented By: KEVIN N. STARKEY
Represented By: SCOTT W. KENNEALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BELL
Represented By: KEVIN N. STARKEY
Represented By: SCOTT W. KENNEALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?