ABBVIE INC. et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Plaintiff: GENENTECH, INC. and ABBVIE INC.
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv09292
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 08/28/2020. (jdb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ABBVIE INC., GENENTECH, INC. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER LEE CALLO on behalf of ABBVIE INC., GENENTECH, INC. (CALLO, ALEXANDER)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ABBVIE INC., GENENTECH, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (abr)
July 23, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENENTECH, INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABBVIE INC.. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11108805), filed by ABBVIE INC., GENENTECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABBVIE INC. et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENENTECH, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABBVIE INC.
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: ALEXANDER LEE CALLO
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?