ZHANG v. GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Plaintiff: Jun Zhang and JUNE ZHANG
Defendant: GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv09426
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. James Li, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/18/2020. (jmh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Good Standing of PRO HAC J. James Li. (XUE, BIN)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendant an extension to 9/25/2020 to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/25/2020. (jmh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Michael M. Rosensaft To The Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, Dated 8/21/20, Requesting Extension Of Time To Respond To The Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order)(Rosensaft, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M Rosensaft on behalf of GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Rosensaft, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JUN ZHANG re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. James Li (XUE, BIN)
August 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. James Li. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. James Li by JUN ZHANG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. James Li, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(XUE, BIN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUN ZHANG. GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (XUE, BIN)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
July 27, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 24, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by Jun Zhang as to All Defendants. (XUE, BIN)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11120490) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jun Zhang.(XUE, BIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZHANG v. GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Zhang
Represented By: BIN XUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE ZHANG
Represented By: BIN XUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAIN CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Michael M Rosensaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?