HONE v. LYNCH-FORD et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD HONE
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES, BRAD BILLHIMER, MARTENE LYNCH-FORD, TAYLOR TOSCANO and MARLENE LYNCH-FORD
Case Number: 3:2020cv10367
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT Received. Filed by MARLENE LYNCH-FORD.(jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Michael A. Shipp from RICHARD HONE re. proceeding as an Indigent in a Federal Civil Rights Lawsuit. (jem)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by RICHARD HONE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jem)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL TERRANCE MORAN on behalf of MARLENE LYNCH-FORD (MORAN, MICHAEL)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 2nd AMENDED COMPLAINT Received, filed by RICHARD HONE. (jem)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice the Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed IFP; the Clerk shall close this matter; Plaintiff may submit a new IFP application or may submit the $400 filing fee by 10/20/2020. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/10/2020. (jem)
September 10, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jem)
August 16, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT received, filed by RICHARD HONE.(jem)
August 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by RICHARD HONE. (jem)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (abr ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/13/2020) (abr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HONE v. LYNCH-FORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD BILLHIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTENE LYNCH-FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR TOSCANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARLENE LYNCH-FORD
Represented By: MICHAEL TERRANCE MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?