LING v. LING
Plaintiff: JANINE LING
Defendant: THOMAS LING
Case Number: 3:2020cv10626
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
September 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by THOMAS LING. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affirmation, #3 E-Mail Partnership Agreement, #4 Business Account Verifications, #5 Spreadsheet, #6 Redacted Statements, #7 Redacted Bank Statements, #8 Tab 1, #9 Tab 2, #10 Tab 3, #11 Tab 4, #12 QB Ledger, #13 Operating Agreement #14 Formation Drive) (jmh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Pro se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents filed by THOMAS LING (jmh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANINE LING. THOMAS LING served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS LING. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
August 17, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS LING ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11218664) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JANINE LING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARINO, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LING v. LING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANINE LING
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS LING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?