PASTORINO et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: Sherri Pastorino and THE ESTATE OF BARBARA CUNNINGHAM
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, DOES 1 through 50, inclusive, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, LUZENAC AMERICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, DOES 1-50 and LUZENAC AMERICA, INC.
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv10630
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. LOPALO on behalf of SHERRI PASTORINO, THE ESTATE OF BARBARA CUNNINGHAM (LOPALO, CHRISTOPHER)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
August 17, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-06946. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Conditional Transfer Order - 223 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2738, transferring case to USDC, USDC District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc..(Weissenberger, Emily)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., re Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice (Other) #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 07/31/2020. (Weissenberger, Emily)
July 31, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Imerys Talc America, Inc., Does 1-50, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sherri Pastorino. Filed in State Court on 8/1/2017 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Weissenberger, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-06612 (Weissenberger, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Weissenberger, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Weissenberger, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number BC670933 Receipt No: ACACDC-27451037 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Emily Weissenberger ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Attorney Emily M Weissenberger added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily M Weissenberger added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft))(Weissenberger, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PASTORINO et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON AND JOHNSON
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUZENAC AMERICA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUZENAC AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Pastorino
Represented By: Melissa Anne Agnetti
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. LOPALO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF BARBARA CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: Melissa Anne Agnetti
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. LOPALO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?