WEST v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: TERESA WEST
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PROCUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv10727
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
August 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Personal Care Products Council. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Personal Care Products Council by TERESA WEST. (ZGODA, RICHARD)
August 19, 2020 Member Case Direct File on 8/18/2020, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jal, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PROCUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC"). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PROCUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11225619) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TERESA WEST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ZGODA, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PROCUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA WEST
Represented By: RICHARD M. ZGODA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?