NEMETH v. NEW REZ, LLC
Appellant: ROBERT L. NEMETH, JR.
Appellee: NEW REZ, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv11466
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the MOTION to Reinstate Notice of Appeal attached to docket entry #5 filed by the Clerk's office on 10/08/2020 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jdb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Reinstate Notice of Appeal by ROBERT L. NEMETH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)
October 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Reopen Case. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Reinstate Notice of Appeal filed by ROBERT L. NEMETH, JR. (jmh)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Notice of Appeal in this matter is Dismissed under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003 for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/28/2020. (jmh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(jmh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-11413(MBK), filed by ROBERT L. NEMETH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 TRANSMITTAL, #3 Certificate of Service)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEMETH v. NEW REZ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT L. NEMETH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NEW REZ, LLC
Represented By: ANGELA C. PATTISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?