JENKINSON'S PAVILION et al v. BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH et al
Plaintiff: JENKINSON'S PAVILION, ANTHONY STOVINO, FRANK STORINO and ANTHONY STORINO
Defendant: KEVIN B. RIORDAN, CARYN BYRNES, FRANK STOVINO, DOUGLAS VITALE, BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, ARLENE TESTA, POLICE DEPARTMENT OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, PAUL KANITRA, MAYOR AND COUNCIL OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH and PAUL M. KANITRA
Case Number: 3:2020cv11906
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RIORDAN, KEVIN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Kevin Riordan. (RIORDAN, KEVIN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JENKINSON'S PAVILION re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (GASIOROWSKI, ALEXIS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JENKINSON'S PAVILION re #3 First MOTION to Remand (GASIOROWSKI, ALEXIS)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #3 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' 8/4/20 Letter)(RIORDAN, KEVIN)
September 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION to Remand by JENKINSON'S PAVILION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Letter to Judge Wolfson, #3 Order)(GASIOROWSKI, ALEXIS)
September 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(RIORDAN, KEVIN)
August 31, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Plaintiffs names were spelled incorrectly. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 28, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARLENE TESTA, DOUGLAS VITALE, POLICE DEPARTMENT OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, PAUL KANITRA, BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, MAYOR AND COUNCIL OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, KEVIN B. RIORDAN, CARYN BYRNES from Superior Court of NJ - Ocean County Law Division, case number OCN-L-2009-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11280001), filed by ARLENE TESTA, DOUGLAS VITALE, POLICE DEPARTMENT OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, PAUL KANITRA, BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, MAYOR AND COUNCIL OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH, KEVIN B. RIORDAN, CARYN BYRNES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint/Brief)(RIORDAN, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINSON'S PAVILION et al v. BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARYN BYRNES
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK STOVINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS VITALE
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARLENE TESTA
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE DEPARTMENT OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL KANITRA
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR AND COUNCIL OF BOROUGH OF POINT PLEASANT BEACH
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL M. KANITRA
Represented By: KEVIN B. RIORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENKINSON'S PAVILION
Represented By: ALEXIS LEIGH GASIOROWSKI
Represented By: RONALD S. GASIOROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY STOVINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK STORINO
Represented By: RONALD S. GASIOROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY STORINO
Represented By: RONALD S. GASIOROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?