SMITH et al v. BISHOP et al
Plaintiff: JOANNA SMITH and KEVIN SMITH
Defendant: ABC BUSINESS 1-5, PAT BISHOP, GAVIN BISHOP, ALLEN BISHOP and CORROSION CONTROL SPECIALISTS INCORPORATED
Case Number: 3:2020cv12526
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Certification of kevin smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs Re #10 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,. (LARA, BRIAN)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff Counsel re #10 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,. (LARA, BRIAN)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOANNA SMITH, KEVIN SMITH re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certification certification of plaintiff, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(LARA, BRIAN)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/15/2020. (mg)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 11/16/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(CRINO, THOMAS)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ALLEN BISHOP, PAT BISHOP, CORROSION CONTROL SPECIALISTS INCORPORATED by GAVIN BISHOP.(LEONE, JOSEPH)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs cert of service corrosion control specialists (WILTON, FRANCIS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs cert of service Gavin Bishop (WILTON, FRANCIS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs cert of service allen bishop (WILTON, FRANCIS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs certficate of service Pat Bishop (WILTON, FRANCIS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 , #4 , #5 , and #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Francis Wilton on 10/5/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Certificate of Service. Please resubmit using the event - Summons Returned Executed - that can be found under - Civil Events - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLEN BISHOP, GAVIN BISHOP, PAT BISHOP, CORROSION CONTROL SPECIALISTS INCORPORATED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This case was incorrectly opened using office code 8(Miscellaneous) and assigned civil action no. 8:20-cv-12526. This case has been copied to Trenton and assigned a new civil action no. 3:20-cv-12526. In the future, please refrain from using office code 8(Miscellaneous). When choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. It was selected that this case has been filed AGAINST ALL the Plaintiffs. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLEN BISHOP, GAVIN BISHOP, PAT BISHOP, CORROSION CONTROL SPECIALISTS INCORPORATED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number BNJDC-11337888) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KEVIN SMITH, JOANNA SMITH.(LARA, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. BISHOP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC BUSINESS 1-5
Represented By: THOMAS M. CRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAT BISHOP
Represented By: THOMAS M. CRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAVIN BISHOP
Represented By: JOSEPH VINCENT LEONE
Represented By: THOMAS M. CRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN BISHOP
Represented By: THOMAS M. CRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORROSION CONTROL SPECIALISTS INCORPORATED
Represented By: THOMAS M. CRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNA SMITH
Represented By: BRIAN ALFONSO LARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN SMITH
Represented By: BRIAN ALFONSO LARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?