HODSOLL v. ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Shakir Hodsoll
Defendant: Contractor Management Services, Brentwood Services Administrators, ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Case Number: 3:2020cv12537
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/5/2020, via telephone. (eh, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Bedivere Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (MCBARRON, JAMES)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCBARRON, JAMES)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BRENTWOOD SERVICES ADMINISTRATORS.(MCBARRON, JAMES)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CONTRACTOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES.(MCBARRON, JAMES)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCBARRON, JAMES)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCBARRON, JAMES)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ordered Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will be held via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/19/2020. (eh, )
September 11, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
September 11, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. MCBARRON on behalf of ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Brentwood Services Administrators, Contractor Management Services, ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY (MCBARRON, JAMES)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Contractor Management Services, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Brentwood Services Administrators, ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Monmouth County, case number MON-L-2423-2020. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11338581), filed by Contractor Management Services, ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Brentwood Services Administrators, ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCBARRON, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HODSOLL v. ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakir Hodsoll
Represented By: CHARLES JOHN ULIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractor Management Services
Represented By: JAMES P. MCBARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Services Administrators
Represented By: JAMES P. MCBARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. MCBARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. MCBARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?